This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 04/21/2021 at 18:05:35 (UTC).

EARNEST, CYNTHIA A VS EARNEST, JASON CURTIS

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 EARNEST, CYNTHIA A filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against EARNEST, JASON CURTIS. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SHONNA GAY and GAY, SHONNA YOUNG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SHONNA GAY

GAY, SHONNA YOUNG

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EARNEST, CYNTHIA A

Respondent

EARNEST, JASON CURTIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

STUDSTILL, CLAYTON BOWERS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLSD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event INJUNCTION HEARING on 4/15/2021 0905 AM Judge SHONNA GAY results DISMISSED on 4/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, REPEAT VIOLENCE, DATING VIOLENCE, OR SEXUAL VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketEvent INJUNCTION HEARING scheduled on 4/15/2021 at 0905 AM, MX - Judge SHONNA GAY presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event INJUNCTION HEARING on 4/1/2021 0900 AM Judge SHONNA GAY results CONTINUED on 4/1/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE JASON EARNEST SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent INJUNCTION HEARING scheduled on 4/1/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge SHONNA GAY presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCase 232021DR000032DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STUDSTILL, CLAYTON BOWERS