This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 12/20/2019 at 19:02:32 (UTC).

DURAY, MINOALA RAY, KYSER, ELLEN RAY Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 DURAY, MINOALA RAY, KYSER, ELLEN RAY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GAY, SHONNA YOUNG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Gulf County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gulf County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GAY, SHONNA YOUNG

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

THOMPSON, ETHEL VIVIAN

MONDY, LOLA RAY

KYSER, ELLEN RAY

RAY, ALBERT

DURAY, MINOALA RAY

RAY, RICHARD

TAYLOR, ZOLA RAY

Decedent

RAY, DONALD WAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

MALLORY, SHERRI DENTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • Payment received: $4.30 Receipt Number MX 2019003644

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Assessment 3 Total Assessed $0.30 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $4.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $0.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DATED 04/29/2014 OF DONALD W RAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION E FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • OATH OF PR & DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACC AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT SIGNED BY ETHEL VIVIAN THOMPSON a/k/a VIVIAN RAY THOMPSON ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • NOTICE / DESIGNATION OF E MAIL ADDRESS ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION E FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2019003524

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Case 232019CP000084PRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.