This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 04/21/2022 at 06:40:40 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS HALL, ROSE E

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HALL, ROSE E. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES, MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J and TIMOTHY MCFARLAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J

TIMOTHY MCFARLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

HALL, ROSE E

Wewahitchka, FL 32465

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN, MATTHEW STEWART

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET ( E FILED )

03/10/2021:COVER SHEET ( E FILED )

SUMMONS ( PROPOSED ) ( E FILED )

03/10/2021:SUMMONS ( PROPOSED ) ( E FILED )

NOTICE TO APPEAR 04 08 2021 300 PM ET ( E FILED )

03/11/2021:NOTICE TO APPEAR 04 08 2021 300 PM ET ( E FILED )

STATEMENT OF CLAIM ( E FILED )

03/10/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM ( E FILED )

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED ON INDIVIDUAL ROSE HALL ON 03 24 2021 AT 900 AM ( E FILED )

04/07/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED ON INDIVIDUAL ROSE HALL ON 03 24 2021 AT 900 AM ( E FILED )

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 03 24 2021 920 AM ROSE HALL INDIVIDUAL SERVICE ( E FILED )

04/09/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 03 24 2021 920 AM ROSE HALL INDIVIDUAL SERVICE ( E FILED )

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( E FILED )

04/29/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( E FILED )

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLSD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 03 24 2021 920 AM ROSE HALL INDIVIDUAL SERVICE ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCASE MINUTES 04 08 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/08/2021 15:00; Judge: MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE/OTHER RM 126

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED ON INDIVIDUAL ROSE HALL ON 03 24 2021 AT 900 AM ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR 04 08 2021 300 PM ET ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE TRIAL HEARING scheduled on 4/8/2021 at 0300 PM, XX - Judge TIMOTHY MCFARLAND presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2021000565

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ( PROPOSED ) ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCase 232021SC000027SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN, MATTHEW STEWART