This case was last updated from Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/21/2022 at 07:32:49 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C VS DAVIS, DANIEL BRUCE Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DAVIS, DANIEL BRUCE. This case was filed in Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLLIER, DEVIN D and DEVIN COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLLIER, DEVIN D

DEVIN COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C

Defendants

THOMPSON DAVIS, LISA

DAVIS, DANIEL BRUCE

LAKES AT BOCA RATON HOMEOWNERS

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS, SARA BETH

Defendant Attorney

SHULER, THOMAS MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/06/2022:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

03/02/2022:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED LISA DAVIS 1/28/22

01/29/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED LISA DAVIS 1/28/22

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED

01/28/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED NOT FOUND

01/28/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED NOT FOUND

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED 12.28.22

01/28/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED 12.28.22

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED NON SERVED

01/28/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED NON SERVED

NOTICE OF HEARING MARCH 3 2022

01/24/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING MARCH 3 2022

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

01/19/2022:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION ON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED BECAUSE THE MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM IS TIME BARRED

01/17/2022:MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION ON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED BECAUSE THE MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM IS TIME BARRED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/05/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY LAKES AT BOCA RATON HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

11/04/2021:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY LAKES AT BOCA RATON HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

10/27/2021:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS UNKNOWN TENANT 1

10/28/2021:SUMMONS UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SUMMONS LAKES AT BOCA RATON

10/28/2021:SUMMONS LAKES AT BOCA RATON

SUMMONS DANIEL DAVIS

10/28/2021:SUMMONS DANIEL DAVIS

SUMMONS LISA THOMPSON DAVIS

10/28/2021:SUMMONS LISA THOMPSON DAVIS

SUMMONS UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

10/28/2021:SUMMONS UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/03/2022 13:45; Judge: COLLIER, DEVIN D; Docket Type: MOTION HEARING; Location: ZOOM TELECONFERENCE ZOOM T; Defendant Attorney: SHULER, THOMAS M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/03/2022 13:45; Judge: COLLIER, DEVIN D; Docket Type: MOTION HEARING; Location: ZOOM TELECONFERENCE ZOOM T; Defendant Attorney: SHULER, THOMAS M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketAMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT AGREED ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION T ODISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event MOTION HEARING on 3/3/2022 0145 PM Judge DEVIN COLLIER results CANCELLED on 3/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED LISA DAVIS 1/28/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED NOT FOUND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketSTANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCase 232021CA000084CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAKES AT BOCA RATON HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARA B COLLINS, ESQ