This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 06/17/2022 at 19:08:16 (UTC).

DEPUY, CRYSTAL J, DEPUY, TIMOTHY L Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 DEPUY, CRYSTAL J, DEPUY, TIMOTHY L was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLIER, DEVIN D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLIER, DEVIN D

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DEPUY, CRYSTAL J

Decedent

DEPUY, TIMOTHY L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COSTIN, CHARLES ANTHONY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO AMEND ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR OF RELATION OF DECENDENT TO PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ( E FILED )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ( INTESTATE )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketOATH OF PR & DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACC OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE (CRYSTAL JOY DEPUY) ( E FILED )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION ( E FILED )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2022001175

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCase 232022CP000039PRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COSTIN, CHARLES ANTHONY