This case was last updated from Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/21/2022 at 07:42:30 (UTC).

CLARK, JOSEPH VS BANEY, DAVE Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 CLARK, JOSEPH filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against BANEY, DAVE. This case was filed in Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GAY, SHONNA YOUNG and COLLIER, DEVIN D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GAY, SHONNA YOUNG

COLLIER, DEVIN D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLARK, JOSEPH

Defendants

BANEY, DAVE

RICKETT, ROBIN LEANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

KELLY, RYAN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

11/16/2021:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

11/16/2021:SUMMONS

SUMMONS- EXECUTED (EMAILED TO PLF)

11/16/2021:SUMMONS- EXECUTED (EMAILED TO PLF)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/30/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RETURN OF SERVICE served

12/01/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE served

COMPLAINT

11/16/2021:COMPLAINT

MOTION TO REMONVE COUNSEL OF RECORD AND MOTION TO STOP FRAUD BY DEFENSE COUNSEL

11/30/2021:MOTION TO REMONVE COUNSEL OF RECORD AND MOTION TO STOP FRAUD BY DEFENSE COUNSEL

RESPONSE BY DEFENDANT IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMOVE COUNSEL OF RECORD

12/13/2021:RESPONSE BY DEFENDANT IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMOVE COUNSEL OF RECORD

MOTION TO DISMISS

12/21/2021:MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION TO DISMISS

12/21/2021:MOTION TO DISMISS

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT

12/28/2021:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE BY DEFENDANT IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMOVE COUNSEL OF RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO REMONVE COUNSEL OF RECORD AND MOTION TO STOP FRAUD BY DEFENSE COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLSD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketOTHER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- EXECUTED (EMAILED TO PLF)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR INDIGENCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCase 232021CA000086CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/16/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLY , RYAN MICHAEL