This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 09/16/2020 at 06:01:30 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS HENDERSON, TERRY

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed an Other lawsuit against HENDERSON, TERRY. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J and MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

HENDERSON, TERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, JEFFREY LEE

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE - UNSERVED 12/31/2019 on TERRY HENDERSON - (E FILED)

03/13/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE - UNSERVED 12/31/2019 on TERRY HENDERSON - (E FILED)

TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS EXECUTED FOR TERRY HENDERSON

11/13/2019:TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS EXECUTED FOR TERRY HENDERSON

COVER SHEET

11/13/2019:COVER SHEET

SUMMONS PERSONAL SERVICE ON A NATURAL PERSON IMPORTANT (PROPOSED) (EFILED)

11/13/2019:SUMMONS PERSONAL SERVICE ON A NATURAL PERSON IMPORTANT (PROPOSED) (EFILED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - UNSERVED 12/31/2019 on TERRY HENDERSON - (E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT TERRY HENDERSON NONSERVED ON 12/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTWENTY DAYS SUMMONS EXECUTED FOR TERRY HENDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2019003320

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS PERSONAL SERVICE ON A NATURAL PERSON IMPORTANT (PROPOSED) (EFILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCase 232019CC000215CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAHN, JEFFREY LEE