This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 09/16/2020 at 06:01:20 (UTC).

CASCADE CAPITAL LLC ASSIGNEE O VS PAGE, AMBER Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/11/2019 CASCADE CAPITAL LLC ASSIGNEE O filed an Other lawsuit against PAGE, AMBER. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J and MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASCADE CAPITAL LLC ASSIGNEE O

Defendants

PAGE, AMBER

PAGE, LINDSEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK (E FILED)

02/27/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK (E FILED)

DEFAULT (PROPOSED) ( E FILED)

02/27/2020:DEFAULT (PROPOSED) ( E FILED)

CLERKS DEFAULT (EXECUTED)

02/12/2020:CLERKS DEFAULT (EXECUTED)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ( E FILED)

02/12/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT ( E FILED)

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED AMBER PAGE SERVED ON JANUARY 3 WITH COMPLAINT ( E FILED)

01/24/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED AMBER PAGE SERVED ON JANUARY 3 WITH COMPLAINT ( E FILED)

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED AMBER PAGE SERVED WITH COMPLAINT ON JANUARY 3RD, 2020 VIA SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ( E FILED)

01/24/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED AMBER PAGE SERVED WITH COMPLAINT ON JANUARY 3RD, 2020 VIA SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ( E FILED)

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LINDSEY PAGE SERVED VIA SUBSTITUTE SERVICE TO AMBER PAGE ON JANUARY 3, 2020

01/06/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LINDSEY PAGE SERVED VIA SUBSTITUTE SERVICE TO AMBER PAGE ON JANUARY 3, 2020

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMBER PAGE SERVED ON JAUARY 3, 2020

01/06/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMBER PAGE SERVED ON JAUARY 3, 2020

TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS EXECUTED FOR AMBER PAGE ( E FILED)

11/12/2019:TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS EXECUTED FOR AMBER PAGE ( E FILED)

TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS EXECUTED FOR LINDSEY PAGE ( E FILED)

11/12/2019:TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS EXECUTED FOR LINDSEY PAGE ( E FILED)

COVER SHEET

11/11/2019:COVER SHEET

SUMMONS TO LINDSEY PAGE (PROPOSED) (EFILED)

11/11/2019:SUMMONS TO LINDSEY PAGE (PROPOSED) (EFILED)

SUMMONS TO AMBER PAGE (PROPOSED) (EFILED)

11/11/2019:SUMMONS TO AMBER PAGE (PROPOSED) (EFILED)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK (E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT (PROPOSED) ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERKS DEFAULT (EXECUTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE NON MILITARY SERVICE ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF PROPOSED CLERKS DEFAULT ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED AMBER PAGE SERVED ON JANUARY 3 WITH COMPLAINT ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED AMBER PAGE SERVED WITH COMPLAINT ON JANUARY 3RD, 2020 VIA SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LINDSEY PAGE SERVED VIA SUBSTITUTE SERVICE TO AMBER PAGE ON JANUARY 3, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $320.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $320.00 Balance Remaining $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO LINDSEY PAGE (PROPOSED) (EFILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO AMBER PAGE (PROPOSED) (EFILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketCase 232019CC000208CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASCADE CAPITAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daley, Sarah C