This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 04/20/2022 at 05:46:09 (UTC).

BRUNO LAGGOS, LINDA, LAGGOS, KEITH B Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 BRUNO LAGGOS, LINDA, LAGGOS, KEITH B was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GAY, SHONNA YOUNG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GAY, SHONNA YOUNG

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

LAGGOS, KEITH B

Decedent

BRUNO LAGGOS, LINDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

HUDSON, MARY BRANNON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLSD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY MARY BRANNON HUDSON ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION ( E FIELD )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE KEITH B LAGGOS ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number MX 2021000715

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY FOR CREDITORS ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION LESS THAN $1000.00 AND DEATH CERTIFICATE AND ORDER APPOINTING REPRESENTATIVE OF DECENDENTS ESTATE ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCase 232021CP000031PRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUDSON, MARY BRANNON