Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 03/30/2021 at 16:43:21 (UTC).

BLUE, BRENDA V VS WALKER, NIECHA RENEE

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 BLUE, BRENDA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VS WALKER, NIECHA RENEE. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TIMOTHY MCFARLAND, MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES and MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Gulf County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gulf County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TIMOTHY MCFARLAND

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLUE, BRENDA V

Defendant

WALKER, NIECHA RENEE

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED 03 03 2021 628 PM ( E FILED )

03/05/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED 03 03 2021 628 PM ( E FILED )

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/02/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/08/2021 10:15; Judge: MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE/OTHER RM 126

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT NIECHA WALKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED 03 03 2021 628 PM ( E FILED )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE TRIAL HEARING scheduled on 4/8/2021 at 1015 AM, XX - Judge TIMOTHY MCFARLAND presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE OF BRENDA V BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase 232021SC000024SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketJudge: MCFARLAND , TIMOTHY J assigned

    Read MoreRead Less