This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 04/20/2022 at 05:46:35 (UTC).

BARRETT, DEBRA SUE, BARRETT, MARK ADAM Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 BARRETT, DEBRA SUE, BARRETT, MARK ADAM was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GAY, SHONNA YOUNG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GAY, SHONNA YOUNG

 

Party Details

Petitioners

GRIFFIN KING, JAN

GRIFFIN HOFAMMANN, TERRY

Not Classified By Court

BARRETT, SCOTT THOMAS

BARRETT, MARK ADAM

Decedent

BARRETT, DEBRA SUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WILLIAMS, JOHN ARTHUR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLSD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE MULTIPLE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY JOHN A WILLIAMS REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER OF DISCHARGE ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE, RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE (FULL WAIVER) ( SCOTT THOMAS BARRETT ) ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE, RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE (FULL WAIVER) ( JOHN A WILLIAMS ) ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE, RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE (FULL WAIVER) ( MARK ADAM BARRETT ) ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDISCHARGE PETITION FOR DISCHARGE FULL WAIVER MULTIPLE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM TERRY GRIFFIN HOFAMMANN 13709.27 EXECUTED ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAMENDED INVENTORY ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF PAID FUNERAL BILL ABANKS MORTUARY AND CREMATORY ALABAMA ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD TESTATE ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PR & DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACC TERRY HOFAMMANN ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PR & DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACC JAN GRIFFIN KING ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION PETITIONERS TERRY GRIFFIN HOFFAMANN AND JAN GRIFFIN KING ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2021000656

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCase 232021CP000027PRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS , JOHN A