This case was last updated from Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/14/2021 at 13:37:55 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST VS UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GAY, SHONNA YOUNG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GAY, SHONNA YOUNG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST

Defendants

UNKNOWN HEIRS OF MARTHA GLADYS

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

09/30/2021:COVER SHEET

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA

09/30/2021:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

09/30/2021:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS

09/30/2021:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

09/30/2021:SUMMONS

SUMMONS (ISSUED)

09/30/2021:SUMMONS (ISSUED)

COPY OF STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

09/30/2021:COPY OF STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

10/08/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

10/08/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT

10/12/2021:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT AND CANCELLATION OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLSD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (ISSUED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $1,934.00 Receipt Number MX 2021002481

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $9.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $1,905.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCase 232021CA000079CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan