This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 11/13/2021 at 20:22:43 (UTC).

AMAN, CHARLES L, LANIER, NAOMI L Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 AMAN, CHARLES L, LANIER, NAOMI L was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GAY, SHONNA YOUNG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GAY, SHONNA YOUNG

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

LANIER, NAOMI L

Decedent

AMAN, CHARLES L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

COSTIN, CHARLES ANTHONY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketINVENTORY ( E FILED )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE INTESTATE ( E FILED )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ( E FILED )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PR & DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACC OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE NAOMI L LANIER ( E FILED )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION ( INTESTATE RESIDENT ) ( E FILED )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2021002371

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCase 232021CP000092PRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COSTIN, CHARLES ANTHONY