This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 04/20/2022 at 05:46:55 (UTC).

ALLEMORE, ELLEN FRANCES, VICKERS, LAURA Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 ALLEMORE, ELLEN FRANCES, VICKERS, LAURA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GAY, SHONNA YOUNG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GAY, SHONNA YOUNG

 

Party Details

Decedent

ALLEMORE, ELLEN FRANCES

Not Classified By Court

VICKERS, LAURA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

MASTERS, JOY MARLER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION PROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE AHCA FORMAL ADMINISTRATION ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF CLAIM ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF CLAIM (NOTHING UPLOADED, SENT THROUGH PORTAL INSTEAD jpr)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION 04 01 2021 04 08 2021 The Star ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE FORMAL NOTICE ( PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM FROM GATESTONE AND CO 2907.75 ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE LAURA VICKERS ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketLETTER LETTER FROM BURKE BLUE TO JUDGE ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF ELLEN ALLEMORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2021000607

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT NOT RECORDED OF NORMAN ALLEMORE AND ELLEN ALLEMORE ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PR & DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACC LAURA VICKERS ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION PETITIONER LAURA VICKERS ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase 232021CP000025PRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASTERS, JOY MARLER