This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 09/17/2020 at 11:59:59 (UTC).

24 MOLD LLC AAO DAVID WENTZELL VS CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 24 MOLD LLC AAO DAVID WENTZELL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TIMOTHY MCFARLAND, MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J and MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TIMOTHY MCFARLAND

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

24 MOLD LLC AAO DAVID WENTZELL

Defendant

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOSKOWITZ, LAURENCE

Defendant Attorney

HART, JONATHAN RICHARD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( E FILED)

03/03/2020:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( E FILED)

MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT ( E FILED)

02/26/2020:MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT ( E FILED)

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ON FEBRUARY 6, 2020 AT 10:55AMET AND PROPOSED ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ( E FILED)

02/05/2020:WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ON FEBRUARY 6, 2020 AT 10:55AMET AND PROPOSED ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ( E FILED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR DEFENDANT

12/23/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF HEARING FOR PRETRIAL ON FEBRUARY 6, 2020 AT 10:55AMET

11/27/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING FOR PRETRIAL ON FEBRUARY 6, 2020 AT 10:55AMET

TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (PROPOSED) (E FILE)

11/27/2019:TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (PROPOSED) (E FILE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLSD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/06/2020 10:55; Judge: MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE/OTHER RM 126; Defendant Attorney: BEILMAN, VINCENT P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ON FEBRUARY 6, 2020 AT 10:55AMET AND PROPOSED ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FOR PRETRIAL ON FEBRUARY 6, 2020 AT 10:55AMET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketEvent PRE TRIAL HEARING scheduled on 2/6/2020 at 1055 AM, XX - Judge TIMOTHY MCFARLAND presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2019003456

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTWENTY DAYS SUMMONS TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (PROPOSED) (E FILE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCase 232019SC000225SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 24 MOLD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moskowitz, Laurence