Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twentieth Circuit Courts - Glades County on 03/25/2021 at 14:32:59 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS BROWN, KENTON L Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BROWN, KENTON L. This case was filed in Twentieth Circuit Courts - Glades County, Glades County Courthouse located in Glades, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LUNDY, JACK E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Twentieth Circuit Courts - Glades County

  • Courthouse:

    Glades County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Glades, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LUNDY, JACK E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

BROWN, KENTON L

TENANT 1, UNKNOWN

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KENTON L BRO

TENANT 2, UNKNOWN

Not Classified By Court

BROWN, KENTON LAMAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES, MEAGHAN ALEXIS

 

Court Documents

LETTER FROM ATTYS OFFICE REQUESTING TO RECORD LIS PENDENS

03/11/2021:LETTER FROM ATTYS OFFICE REQUESTING TO RECORD LIS PENDENS

Certificate of Possession of Note

02/25/2021:Certificate of Possession of Note

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

02/25/2021:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

02/25/2021:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/25/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/25/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketRECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTYS OFFICE REQUESTING TO RECORD LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO KENTON L. BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KENTON L. BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENAT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $440.00 Receipt Number MX 45202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $440.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENAT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KENTON L. BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED KENTON L. BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Possession of Note

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $440.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCase 222021CA000027CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James, Meaghan Alexis