Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twentieth Circuit Courts - Glades County on 03/25/2021 at 14:33:13 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON VS COOPER, SAMUEL A Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against COOPER, SAMUEL A. This case was filed in Twentieth Circuit Courts - Glades County, Glades County Courthouse located in Glades, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LUNDY, JACK E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Twentieth Circuit Courts - Glades County

  • Courthouse:

    Glades County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Glades, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LUNDY, JACK E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Defendants

COOPER, WONDER F

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WONDER F. CO

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPA

COOPER, SAMUEL A

COOPER, TARELL S

TENANT 1, UNKNOWN

TENANT 2, UNKNOWN

Not Classified By Court

COOPER JR, SAMUEL A

COOPER, WONDER FAYE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES, MEAGHAN ALEXIS

 

Court Documents

LETTER FROM ATTYS TO RECORD LIS PENDENS

03/11/2021:LETTER FROM ATTYS TO RECORD LIS PENDENS

Certificate of Possession of Note

02/25/2021:Certificate of Possession of Note

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

02/25/2021:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

02/25/2021:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/25/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/25/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTYS TO RECORD LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketRECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED- UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE SENT TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED- TARELL S. COOPER SENT TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED- SAMUEL A. COOPER SENT TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WONDER F. COOPER SENT TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN TENAT #1 SENT TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN TENAT #2 SENT TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED- WONDER F. COOPER SENT TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $470.00 Receipt Number MX 45203

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - TARELL S. COOPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED- SAMUEL A. COOPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Possession of Note

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $470.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCase 222021CA000028CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James, Meaghan Alexis