This case was last updated from Glades County Courts on 10/14/2021 at 16:06:26 (UTC).

SCHULZE, RICHARD M VS SCHULZE, MAUREEN GREEN

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 SCHULZE, RICHARD M filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SCHULZE, MAUREEN GREEN. This case was filed in Glades County Courts, Glades County Courthouse located in Glades, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LUNDY, JACK E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Glades, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LUNDY, JACK E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SCHULZE, RICHARD M

Respondent

SCHULZE, MAUREEN GREEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Respondent Attorney

VOGELSANG, BETH TYLER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketRECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketRCVD FILE BACK FROM JUDGE'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketFILE SENT TO JUDGES OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 48165

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING- HUSBAND'S NOTICE OF FILING CORROBORATION OF RESIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketVITAL STATISTICS FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer and Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketSPECIAL INTERROGATORIES FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAGREEMENT FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT IN UNCONSTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCase 222021DR000107DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vogelsang, Beth Tyler