This case was last updated from Glades County Courts on 04/20/2022 at 06:00:03 (UTC).

HAHN, PETER, HAHN, TERRY Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/17/2021 HAHN, PETER, HAHN, TERRY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Glades County Courts, Glades County Courthouse located in Glades, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LUNDY, JACK E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Glades, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LUNDY, JACK E

 

Party Details

Decedent

HAHN, TERRY

Not Classified By Court

HAHN, PETER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

TRUEBLOOD, TRAVIS W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE (SINGLE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE)-- FORWARD TO (RECORDING)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketFILE SENT TO JUDGES OFFICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketWAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketWAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketOBJECTION TO CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketOBJECTION TO CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketPETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCase 222021CP000088CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less