This case was last updated from Glades County Courts on 10/13/2021 at 13:55:46 (UTC).

CHILLEMI, MICHAEL VS RAMIREZ, SERENA Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 CHILLEMI, MICHAEL filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against RAMIREZ, SERENA. This case was filed in Glades County Courts, Glades County Courthouse located in Glades, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LUNDY, JACK E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Glades, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LUNDY, JACK E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHILLEMI, MICHAEL

Defendants

RAMIREZ, SERENA

WILLIAMS, IRA

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

09/30/2021:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FILED AGAINST:

09/24/2021:MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FILED AGAINST:

RESIDENTIAL LEASE AGREEMENT

09/13/2021:RESIDENTIAL LEASE AGREEMENT

NOTICE TO VACATE (3 DAYS)

09/13/2021:NOTICE TO VACATE (3 DAYS)

EVICTION COMPLAINT

09/13/2021:EVICTION COMPLAINT

Receipt Copy

09/13/2021:Receipt Copy

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FILED AGAINST:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- IRA WILLIAMS SERVED 9/14/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- SERENA RAMIREZ -SERVED 9/14/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED- SENT TO GCSO WITH CHECK# 3742 - IRA WILLIAMS WITH PETITION AND 3 DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED- SENT TO GCSO WITH CHECK #3742- SERENA RAMIREZ WITH PETITION & 3 DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketActive Process CIVIL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketActive Process CIVIL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO VACATE (3 DAYS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt Copy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $205.00 Receipt Number MX 48072

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $20.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase 222021CC000111CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less