This case was last updated from Glades County Courts on 05/20/2022 at 16:50:34 (UTC).

BRASWELL, JANIE KAY, JOHNS, JOHNNIE VIRGINIA Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2022 BRASWELL, JANIE KAY, JOHNS, JOHNNIE VIRGINIA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Glades County Courts, Glades County Courthouse located in Glades, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LUNDY, JACK E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Glades, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LUNDY, JACK E

 

Party Details

Decedent

JOHNS, JOHNNIE VIRGINIA

Not Classified By Court

BRASWELL, JANIE KAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Not Classified By Court Attorney

TRUEBLOOD, TRAVIS W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketRECORDED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketRECORDED ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING\ LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND (SINGLE)- TODD CHRISTOPHER JOHNS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND (SINGLE)- STANLO JEFFREY JOHNS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 51929

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT--- CASE # ON NOTICE OF FILING WAS INCOORECT, FILED IN CORRECT CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITH COURT FILING (CONTEMPORANEOUS FILING)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCase 222022CP000036CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less