This case was last updated from Glades County Courts on 11/13/2021 at 16:11:53 (UTC).

BALA, AYER, BALA, GEETHA Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 BALA, AYER, BALA, GEETHA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Glades County Courts, Glades County Courthouse located in Glades, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LUNDY, JACK E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Glades, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LUNDY, JACK E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BALA, GEETHA

Decedent

BALA, AYER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketRECORDED ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketRECORDED ORDER ADMITTING WILL OF NONRESIDENT TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (SENT TO RECORDING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL OF NONRESIDENT TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketRECORDED EXEMPLIFICATION COPIES LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, PETITION TO PROBATE WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketRECORDED GEORGIA DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEXEMPLIFIED COPIES FROM GEORGIA COUNTY OF CHATHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FROM GEORGIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketMEMO TO CLERK : EX-PARTE SLIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number MX 48078

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase 222021CP000076CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less