This case was last updated from Glades County Courts on 07/07/2019 16:45:10

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 a Probate - Other Probate case was filed by BAILEY, DOROTHY JANE, BAILEY, GARY LANE in the jurisdiction of Glades County Courts, Glades County Courthouse located in Glades, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXAXMX
  • Filing Date 06/13/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Probate - Other Probate
  • Jurisdiction Glades County Courts
  • Judge LUNDY, JACK E
  • Courthouse Glades County Courthouse
  • County Glades
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Not Yet Classified PEARCE, PATRICIA BAILEY
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Not Yet Classified TEAGLE, VICKIE BAILEY
  • Represented By
    • BREWER, WILLIAM CHESTER
  • Decedent BAILEY, DOROTHY JANE
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Not Yet Classified RIDPATH, SHARON BAILEY
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Not Yet Classified BAILEY, GARY LANE
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • Receipt Copy
  • 07/01/2019
  • Payment received: $21.00 Receipt Number MX 34733
  • 07/01/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $21.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 07/01/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $21.00
  • 06/24/2019
  • Event HEARING - CP scheduled on 7/8/2019 at 1100 AM, MX - Judge JACK LUNDY presiding.
  • 06/24/2019
  • NOTICE OF HEARING - 7/8/2019 @ 11 AM (PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; PETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; AND PETITION TO DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPERTY)
  • 06/24/2019
  • MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING
  • 06/20/2019
  • ORDER ON AMENDED MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY
  • 06/20/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER DETERMINING EXEMPT PROPERTY
  • 06/20/2019
  • PROPOSED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION
  • 06/20/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE
  • 06/20/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE (LEO BAILEY JR)
  • 06/20/2019
  • AMENDED DEATH CERTIFICATE (DOROTHY JANE BAILEY)
  • 06/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING DEATH CERTIFICATE OF LEO BAILEY JR
  • 06/14/2019
  • Death Certificate (copy)
  • 06/14/2019
  • Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 34360
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned
  • 06/13/2019
  • Affidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due
  • 06/13/2019
  • WAIVER OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WIAVER OF NOTICE AND BOND (SHARON BAILEY RIDPATH)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.