This case was last updated from Gilchrist County Courts on 07/08/2019 17:35:20

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by WEST, TIMOTHY against WEST, CHRISTY AYERS in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County Courts, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXAXMX
  • Filing Date 06/14/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce
  • Jurisdiction Gilchrist County Courts
  • Judge MILLER-JONES, SUSAN
  • Courthouse Gilchrist County Courthouse
  • County Gilchrist
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Petitioner WEST, TIMOTHY
  • Represented By
    • DECKER, ANDREW JOSEPH
  • Respondent WEST, CHRISTY AYERS
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • Event HEARING scheduled on 8/27/2019 at 0200 PM, MX - Judge SUSAN MILLER-JONES presiding.
  • 07/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF HEARING 8-27-19
  • 06/17/2019
  • Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 14051
  • 06/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/17/2019
  • Judge: Assigned
  • 06/14/2019
  • Waiver OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
  • 06/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER
  • 06/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER
  • 06/14/2019
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage
  • 06/14/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Case 212019DR000141DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/14/2019

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.