This case was last updated from Gilchrist County Courts on 11/17/2020 at 16:37:49 (UTC).

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC VS HALIBURTON, DESIREE

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HALIBURTON, DESIREE. This case was filed in Gilchrist County Courts, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SHEREE LANCASTER, LANCASTER, SHEREE HIERS and LANCASTER, SHEREE H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SHEREE LANCASTER

LANCASTER, SHEREE HIERS

LANCASTER, SHEREE H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC

Defendant

HALIBURTON, DESIREE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, JONATHAN ROBERT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/19/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

10/19/2020:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

10/19/2020:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

10/19/2020:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DESIREE HALIBURTON TO APPEAR FOR PTC ON 12/15/2020 AT 2:00 PM. ISSUED BY CLERK

10/20/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO DESIREE HALIBURTON TO APPEAR FOR PTC ON 12/15/2020 AT 2:00 PM. ISSUED BY CLERK

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

10/26/2020:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

10/29/2020:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/15/2020 14:00; Judge: LANCASTER, SHEREE H; Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE CHAMBE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DESIREE HALIBURTON TO APPEAR FOR PTC ON 12/15/2020 AT 2:00 PM. ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 12/15/2020 at 0200 PM, MX - Judge SHEREE LANCASTER presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 19123

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCase 212020SC000127SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Velocity Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Singer, Jonathan Robert, ESQ.