This case was last updated from Gilchrist County Courts on 08/14/2020 at 13:40:00 (UTC).

STERRETT, BRIAN, STERRETT, THOMAS EDWIN Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 STERRETT, BRIAN, STERRETT, THOMAS EDWIN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Gilchrist County Courts, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRASINGTON, MONICA J and BRASINGTON, MONICA J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Gilchrist County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRASINGTON, MONICA J

BRASINGTON, MONICA J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STERRETT, BRIAN

Decedent

STERRETT, THOMAS EDWIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Decedent Attorney

LANDER, LINDSEY BOYD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketJudge: BRASINGTON , MONICA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE - ORIGINAL - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM LINDSEY LANDER, ATTORNEY AT LAW DATED 5-28-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketPetition to Determine Homestead

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number MX 17503

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCase 212020CP000025CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less