This case was last updated from Gilchrist County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/20/2022 at 15:30:56 (UTC).

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC VS MCMAHON, JAMIE L J Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MCMAHON, JAMIE L J. This case was filed in Gilchrist County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GROEB, ROBERT KIRK and Groeb, Robert K. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GROEB, ROBERT KIRK

Groeb, Robert K

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

MCMAHON, JAMIE L J

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMIE L J MC

SUNTRUST BANK

Not Classified By Court

JOHNSON MCMAHON, JAMIE LYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/21/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

07/21/2022:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

07/21/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT.702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

07/21/2022:NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT.702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

SUMMONS JAMIE J. MCMAHON A/K/A JAMIE LYN JOHNSON MCMAHON

07/21/2022:SUMMONS JAMIE J. MCMAHON A/K/A JAMIE LYN JOHNSON MCMAHON

SUMMONS SUNTRUST BANK C/O PRESIDENT VICE PRESIDENT OR ANY OTHER OFFICER AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE

07/21/2022:SUMMONS SUNTRUST BANK C/O PRESIDENT VICE PRESIDENT OR ANY OTHER OFFICER AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE

SUMMONS UNKSPOUSE OF JAMIE J MCMAHON A/K/A JAMIE LYN JOHNSON MCMAHON

07/21/2022:SUMMONS UNKSPOUSE OF JAMIE J MCMAHON A/K/A JAMIE LYN JOHNSON MCMAHON

NOTICE STANDING MANAGEMENT ORDER

07/21/2022:NOTICE STANDING MANAGEMENT ORDER

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

07/21/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS

07/21/2022:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

07/21/2022:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

07/21/2022:SUMMONS

LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERIVCE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONSTO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

08/01/2022:LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERIVCE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONSTO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUNG CLERK OF COURT

08/01/2022:LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUNG CLERK OF COURT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

08/03/2022:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

08/03/2022:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUNG CLERK OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERIVCE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONSTO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketJudge: Groeb , Robert K Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS JAMIE J. MCMAHON A/K/A JAMIE LYN JOHNSON MCMAHON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT.702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $1,944.00 Receipt Number MX 25562

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $1,944.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $1,944.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCase 212022CA000043CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUNTRUST BANKS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan