This case was last updated from Gilchrist County Courts on 07/16/2020 at 21:24:29 (UTC).

SIDELL PROPERTIES AND INVESTME VS HIGH, LEONARD G

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 SIDELL PROPERTIES AND INVESTME filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HIGH, LEONARD G. This case was filed in Gilchrist County Courts, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SHEREE LANCASTER, LANCASTER, SHEREE HIERS and LANCASTER, SHEREE H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SHEREE LANCASTER

LANCASTER, SHEREE HIERS

LANCASTER, SHEREE H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIDELL PROPERTIES AND INVESTME

Defendant

HIGH, LEONARD G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCKOY, DOUGLAS KENT

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE LEONARD HIGH NOT SERVED

06/16/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE LEONARD HIGH NOT SERVED

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR LEONARD HIGH

05/29/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR LEONARD HIGH

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/29/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 08/19/2020 09:30; Judge: LANCASTER, SHEREE H; Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE CHAMBE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE LEONARD HIGH NOT SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 8/19/2020 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge SHEREE LANCASTER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR LEONARD HIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR JUDGMENT ON PROMISSORY NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 17526

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCase 212020SC000069SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCKOY, DOUGLAS KENT