This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Gilchrist County on 10/16/2021 at 15:31:25 (UTC).

SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK VS COLLINS, JENNIFER PADOT Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against COLLINS, JENNIFER PADOT. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Gilchrist County, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FLOYD, KATHERINE LEIGH and FLOYD, KATHERINE L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FLOYD, KATHERINE LEIGH

FLOYD, KATHERINE L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK

Defendants

NATURE COAST DEVELOPMENT GROUP

VILLASIS LLC

HAROLD, JANA COLLINS

COLLINS, JENNIFER PADOT

WB SERVICES INC

US SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

NIVEA HOSPITALITY LLC

SUWANNEE GLASS INC

UNKNOWN LESSEES OR TENANTS

PADOT, MARITES RAMOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HYATT, JOEL WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, BY SUWANNEE GLASS INC.

10/14/2021:ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, BY SUWANNEE GLASS INC.

NOTICE OF FILING - SERVICE OF PROCESS ON US SPECIALTY INS. CO

10/13/2021:NOTICE OF FILING - SERVICE OF PROCESS ON US SPECIALTY INS. CO

RETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED AS TO UNKNOWN TENANTS OR LESSEES ON 10/7/21

10/12/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED AS TO UNKNOWN TENANTS OR LESSEES ON 10/7/21

RETURNED MAIL FOR UNKNOWN TENANTS - ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

10/08/2021:RETURNED MAIL FOR UNKNOWN TENANTS - ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

Acceptance OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE

10/05/2021:Acceptance OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE

Acceptance OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE

10/05/2021:Acceptance OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE

Acceptance OF SERVICE OF WAIVER AND SERVICE

10/05/2021:Acceptance OF SERVICE OF WAIVER AND SERVICE

Acceptance OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE

10/05/2021:Acceptance OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE

Acceptance OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE

10/05/2021:Acceptance OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE

COMPLAINT

09/16/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

09/16/2021:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

09/16/2021:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

09/16/2021:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

09/16/2021:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

09/16/2021:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

09/16/2021:SUMMONS

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

09/16/2021:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/16/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, BY SUWANNEE GLASS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - SERVICE OF PROCESS ON US SPECIALTY INS. CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED AS TO UNKNOWN TENANTS OR LESSEES ON 10/7/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL FOR UNKNOWN TENANTS - ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcceptance OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcceptance OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcceptance OF SERVICE OF WAIVER AND SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcceptance OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcceptance OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE AS TO JANA COLLINS HAROLD, SERVED ON 9/20/21

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCase 212021CA000037CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where U S Specialty Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hyatt, Joel William