This case was last updated from Gilchrist County Courts on 04/21/2022 at 07:22:24 (UTC).

ROBERTS, DALE VS BAKER, JOSEPH Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 ROBERTS, DALE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BAKER, JOSEPH. This case was filed in Gilchrist County Courts, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SHEREE LANCASTER, LANCASTER, SHEREE HIERS and LANCASTER, SHEREE H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SHEREE LANCASTER

LANCASTER, SHEREE HIERS

LANCASTER, SHEREE H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTS, DALE

Defendants

BAKER, JOSEPH

LANGFORD, TINA

 

Court Documents

Receipt

10/20/2021:Receipt

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/20/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS TO JOSEPH BAKER - ISSUED BY CLERK

10/20/2021:SUMMONS TO JOSEPH BAKER - ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO TINA LANGFORD - ISSUED BY CLERK

10/20/2021:SUMMONS TO TINA LANGFORD - ISSUED BY CLERK

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO JOSEPH BAKER ONLY

11/03/2021:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO JOSEPH BAKER ONLY

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

11/03/2021:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO SUMMONS/COMPLAINT

11/04/2021:DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO SUMMONS/COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

11/05/2021:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE AS TO JOSEPH BAKER, NONSERVED ON 10/28/21

11/05/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE AS TO JOSEPH BAKER, NONSERVED ON 10/28/21

RETURN OF SERVICE AS TO TINA LANGFORD, SERVED ON 10/28/21

11/05/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE AS TO TINA LANGFORD, SERVED ON 10/28/21

MOTION FOR HEARING

11/05/2021:MOTION FOR HEARING

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

11/05/2021:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

ORDER SETTING REMOTE HEARING

11/09/2021:ORDER SETTING REMOTE HEARING

ORDER FINAL JUDGMENT - EVICTION AND DAMAGES

11/17/2021:ORDER FINAL JUDGMENT - EVICTION AND DAMAGES

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event HEARING-CO CIVIL on 11/17/2021 0945 AM Judge SHEREE LANCASTER results DISPOSED on 11/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/17/2021 09:45; Judge: LANCASTER, SHEREE H; Docket Type: HEARING-CO CIVIL; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE CHAMBE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT- EVICTION AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent HEARING-CO CIVIL scheduled on 11/17/2021 at 0945 AM, MX - Judge SHEREE LANCASTER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING REMOTE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE AS TO TINA LANGFORD, SERVED ON 10/28/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE AS TO JOSEPH BAKER, NONSERVED ON 10/28/21

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $205.00 Receipt Number MX 22736

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $20.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCase 212021CC000069CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketJudge: LANCASTER , SHEREE H HONORABLE assigned

    Read MoreRead Less