This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Gilchrist County on 04/21/2022 at 07:24:07 (UTC).

RHODES, SUSAN VS KARANJA, BRIAN N Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 RHODES, SUSAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KARANJA, BRIAN N. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Gilchrist County, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GROEB, ROBERT KIRK and Groeb, Robert K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GROEB, ROBERT KIRK

Groeb, Robert K

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RHODES, SUSAN

Defendants

MBUGUA, JANE W

KARANJA, BRIAN N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAGEN, STEVEN A

Defendant Attorney

THERRELL, KENDRA B.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/22/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS

11/22/2021:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

11/22/2021:SUMMONS

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

11/22/2021:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

REQUEST FOR ADMISSSIONS TO DEFENDANT, BRIAN KARANJA

11/22/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSSIONS TO DEFENDANT, BRIAN KARANJA

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, JANE MBUGUA

11/22/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, JANE MBUGUA

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/22/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/22/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

11/22/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

11/22/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

11/22/2021:NOTICE OF STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

SUMMONS TO BRIAN KARANJA - ISSUED BY CLERK

11/23/2021:SUMMONS TO BRIAN KARANJA - ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO JANE MBUGUA - ISSUED BY CLERK

11/23/2021:SUMMONS TO JANE MBUGUA - ISSUED BY CLERK

COMPLAINT

11/22/2021:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/15/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketJudge: Groeb , Robert K Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO JANE MBUGUA - ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BRIAN KARANJA - ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, JANE MBUGUA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSSIONS TO DEFENDANT, BRIAN KARANJA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MX 23064

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCase 212021CA000055CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THERRELL, KENDRA