This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Gilchrist County on 06/13/2019 15:30:30

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 a Property - Other Real Property case was filed by REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTIN in the jurisdiction of Eighth Circuit Courts - Gilchrist County, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXAXMX
  • Filing Date 05/20/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Property - Other Real Property
  • Jurisdiction Eighth Circuit Courts - Gilchrist County
  • Judge MILLER-JONES, SUSAN
  • Courthouse Gilchrist County Courthouse
  • County Gilchrist
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Defendant UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DE
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC
  • Represented By
    • FORCE, STEVEN L
  • Defendant WEBBER, FRED
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTIN
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION O
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

05/20/2019:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CL...

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPE...

05/20/2019:SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SU...

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, ASSIGNEES...

05/20/2019:SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES...

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE...

05/20/2019:SUMMONS TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ACTING ON BE...

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS TO FRANK WEBBER

05/20/2019:SUMMONS TO FRANK WEBBER

Free with Subscription
NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

05/20/2019:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER
  • 05/31/2019
  • MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
  • 05/20/2019
  • SUMMONS TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, c/o United States Attorney
  • 05/20/2019
  • SUMMONS TO FRANK WEBBER
  • 05/20/2019
  • SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS WHO MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF CATHERINE GLEASON
  • 05/20/2019
  • SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY
  • 05/20/2019
  • MOTION BY PLAINTIFF FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE PURUSANT TO FLA STAT 90.201
  • 05/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF LEAD COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLA. R. JUD. ADMIN 2.516
  • 05/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING - CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE
  • 05/20/2019
  • MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
  • 05/20/2019
  • VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
  • 05/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
  • 05/20/2019
  • COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE
  • 05/20/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET
  • 05/20/2019
  • Payment received: $954.00 Receipt Number MX 13785
  • 05/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $954.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 05/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $954.00
  • 05/20/2019
  • Judge: Assigned
  • 05/20/2019
  • Case 212019CA000036CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/20/2019

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.