This case was last updated from Gilchrist County Courts on 07/16/2020 at 16:28:13 (UTC).

RENICK, ANGELA VS RENICK, CHRISTOPHER M

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 RENICK, ANGELA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RENICK, CHRISTOPHER M. This case was filed in Gilchrist County Courts, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert Groeb, Groeb, Robert K and GROEB, ROBERT KIRK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Robert Groeb

Groeb, Robert K

GROEB, ROBERT KIRK

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RENICK, ANGELA

Respondent

RENICK, CHRISTOPHER M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ENWALL, PETER CHRISTIAN K

Respondent Attorney

MEADORS, MICHAEL JAY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit FOR CHRISTOPHER RENICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY/MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketWIFE'S RESPONSE TO HUSBAND'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 9/15/2020 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge Robert Groeb presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketEvent NONJURY TRIAL scheduled on 10/13/2020 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge Robert Groeb presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 9-15-20 AND NJ TRIAL 10-13-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketJUDGES NOTES FROM HEARING HELD 5-12-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM PETER ENWALL DATED 5-5-20 ENCLOSING MEDIATION FEE FOR WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketAcceptance AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketJudge: Groeb , Robert K Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, THE STANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER, AND THE UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 16448

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCase 212020DR000020DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/3/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL J MEADORS