This case was last updated from Gilchrist County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/21/2022 at 07:31:39 (UTC).

REGIONS BANK VS CROP PRODUCCTION SERVICES INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 REGIONS BANK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CROP PRODUCCTION SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Gilchrist County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GROEB, ROBERT KIRK, Groeb, Robert K, FLOYD, KATHERINE LEIGH, FLOYD, KATHERINE L and KATHERINE FLOYD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GROEB, ROBERT KIRK

Groeb, Robert K

FLOYD, KATHERINE LEIGH

FLOYD, KATHERINE L

KATHERINE FLOYD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGIONS BANK

Defendants

LANGFORD, JOEY D

NESBIT LANGFORD, TINA A

CROP PRODUCCTION SERVICES INC

GROWERS FERTILIZER CORPORATION

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEUMAN, ROD BARRETT

Defendant Attorney

CURTIS, RYAN COLBY

 

Court Documents

REPORT AND RECEOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE ORDER RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/08/22@9AM

04/13/2022:REPORT AND RECEOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE ORDER RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/08/22@9AM

ORDER AUTHORIZING ZOOM APPEARANCE 4/11/22@9AM

03/25/2022:ORDER AUTHORIZING ZOOM APPEARANCE 4/11/22@9AM

MOTION TO ALLOW ZOOM CONFERENCE HEARING

03/21/2022:MOTION TO ALLOW ZOOM CONFERENCE HEARING

Report and Recommendation of General Magistrate , DROPPING UNKNOWN TENANTS AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

02/28/2022:Report and Recommendation of General Magistrate , DROPPING UNKNOWN TENANTS AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CERTIFICATE OF SERVING DEFAULTS

02/15/2022:CERTIFICATE OF SERVING DEFAULTS

DEFAULT AS TO GROWERS FERTILIZER CORPORATION - ISSUED BY CLERK

02/15/2022:DEFAULT AS TO GROWERS FERTILIZER CORPORATION - ISSUED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/10/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

02/09/2022:ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

ORDER ALLOWING ZOOM CONFERENCE HEARING

02/08/2022:ORDER ALLOWING ZOOM CONFERENCE HEARING

ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS RCVD VIA UPS, FILED IN OFFICE BY CLERK ON 2/3/22

02/03/2022:ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS RCVD VIA UPS, FILED IN OFFICE BY CLERK ON 2/3/22

NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS

02/02/2022:NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

02/02/2022:MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME, ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE, SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT OF CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS

02/02/2022:ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME, ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE, SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT OF CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

02/02/2022:ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

01/20/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/20/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2 ON 1/5/22

01/05/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2 ON 1/5/22

RETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT, NONSERVED ON 1/5/22

01/05/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT, NONSERVED ON 1/5/22

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 08/08/2022 09:00; Judge: FLOYD, KATHERINE L; Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT CONF; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR; Defendant Attorney: CURTIS, RYAN C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 08/08/2022 09:00; Judge: FLOYD, KATHERINE L; Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT CONF; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR; Defendant Attorney: CURTIS, RYAN C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketEvent CASE MANAGEMENT CONF scheduled on 8/8/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge KATHERINE FLOYD presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT AND RECEOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE ORDER RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/08/22@9AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/11/2022 09:00; Judge: FLOYD, KATHERINE L; Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT CONF; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR; Defendant Attorney: CURTIS, RYAN C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/11/2022 09:00; Judge: FLOYD, KATHERINE L; Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT CONF; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR; Defendant Attorney: CURTIS, RYAN C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event CASE MANAGEMENT CONF on 4/11/2022 0900 AM Judge KATHERINE FLOYD results DISPOSED on 4/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER AUTHORIZING ZOOM APPEARANCE 4/11/22@9AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO ALLOW ZOOM CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReport and Recommendation of General Magistrate , DROPPING UNKNOWN TENANTS AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCase 212021CA000056CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crop Production Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Regions Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neuman, Rod B