This case was last updated from Gilchrist County Courts on 07/16/2020 at 15:47:36 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS WILLIAMS, ANTHONY S

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILLIAMS, ANTHONY S. This case was filed in Gilchrist County Courts, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SHEREE LANCASTER, LANCASTER, SHEREE HIERS and LANCASTER, SHEREE H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SHEREE LANCASTER

LANCASTER, SHEREE HIERS

LANCASTER, SHEREE H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

WILLIAMS, ANTHONY S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT

 

Court Documents

ORDER

03/18/2020:ORDER

ORDER ALLOWING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE

03/16/2020:ORDER ALLOWING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE

AFFIDAVIT NON-SERVICE RETURN TO ANTHONY WILLIAMS ON 2-15-20

02/18/2020:AFFIDAVIT NON-SERVICE RETURN TO ANTHONY WILLIAMS ON 2-15-20

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

02/06/2020:ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

LETTER

01/22/2020:LETTER

SUMMONS TO ANTHONY S WILLIAMS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 3/18/2020 AT 10:15 AM

01/22/2020:SUMMONS TO ANTHONY S WILLIAMS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 3/18/2020 AT 10:15 AM

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

01/22/2020:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/18/2020 10:15; Judge: LANCASTER, SHEREE H; Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE CHAMBE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ALLOWING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NON-SERVICE RETURN TO ANTHONY WILLIAMS ON 2-15-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 3/18/2020 at 1015 AM, MX - Judge SHEREE LANCASTER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 16303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO ANTHONY S WILLIAMS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 3/18/2020 AT 10:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase 212020SC000011SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JASON DRAGUTSKY