This case was last updated from Gilchrist County Courts on 12/10/2020 at 16:37:42 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS WHITE, KRISTINA

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WHITE, KRISTINA. This case was filed in Gilchrist County Courts, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LANCASTER, SHEREE HIERS, LANCASTER, SHEREE H and SHEREE LANCASTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LANCASTER, SHEREE HIERS

LANCASTER, SHEREE H

SHEREE LANCASTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

WHITE, KRISTINA

Bell, FL 32619

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, SHAYNA L.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/11/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS

11/11/2020:SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

11/11/2020:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS AS TO KRISTINA WHITE TO APPEAR FOR PTC ON 1/20/21 AT 9:15 AM - ISSUED BY CLERK

11/13/2020:SUMMONS AS TO KRISTINA WHITE TO APPEAR FOR PTC ON 1/20/21 AT 9:15 AM - ISSUED BY CLERK

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/10/2020:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/20/2021 09:15; Judge: LANCASTER, SHEREE H; Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE CHAMBE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS AS TO KRISTINA WHITE TO APPEAR FOR PTC ON 1/20/21 AT 9:15 AM - ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 1/20/2021 at 0915 AM, MX - Judge SHEREE LANCASTER presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 19364

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCase 212020SC000136SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/10/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAYNA L SINGER, ESQ