This case was last updated from Gilchrist County Courts on 07/16/2020 at 15:47:27 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS THOMAS, SCOTT

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THOMAS, SCOTT. This case was filed in Gilchrist County Courts, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SHEREE LANCASTER, LANCASTER, SHEREE HIERS and LANCASTER, SHEREE H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SHEREE LANCASTER

LANCASTER, SHEREE HIERS

LANCASTER, SHEREE H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

THOMAS, SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

01/22/2020:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS - NOTICE TO APPEAR, TO SCOTT THOMAS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 3/18/2020 AT 10:00 AM

01/22/2020:SUMMONS - NOTICE TO APPEAR, TO SCOTT THOMAS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 3/18/2020 AT 10:00 AM

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

02/06/2020:ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

RETURN OF SERVICE

03/02/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE

ORDER ALLOWING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

03/16/2020:ORDER ALLOWING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

EMAIL FROM JUDGE'S OFFICE PROVIDING NEW ADDRESS FOR DEFENDANT

03/18/2020:EMAIL FROM JUDGE'S OFFICE PROVIDING NEW ADDRESS FOR DEFENDANT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/18/2020 10:00; Judge: LANCASTER, SHEREE H; Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE CHAMBE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketOPEN COURT SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketTELEPHONIC HEARING AO SC20-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL FROM JUDGE'S OFFICE PROVIDING NEW ADDRESS FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ALLOWING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SCOTT THOMAS - SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON 2/20/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 3/18/2020 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge SHEREE LANCASTER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOTICE TO APPEAR, TO SCOTT THOMAS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 3/18/2020 AT 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 16298

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase 212020SC000010SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JASON DRAGUTSKY