This case was last updated from Gilchrist County Courts on 08/14/2020 at 12:31:58 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS PHILMAN, TRACY Q

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed an Other lawsuit against PHILMAN, TRACY Q. This case was filed in Gilchrist County Courts, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SHEREE LANCASTER, LANCASTER, SHEREE HIERS and LANCASTER, SHEREE H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SHEREE LANCASTER

LANCASTER, SHEREE HIERS

LANCASTER, SHEREE H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

PHILMAN, TRACY Q

 

Court Documents

ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 9/30/20 @ 10:00

08/12/2020:ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 9/30/20 @ 10:00

AFFIDAVIT RETURN OF SERVICE TO TRACY PHILMAN ON 2-15-20

02/18/2020:AFFIDAVIT RETURN OF SERVICE TO TRACY PHILMAN ON 2-15-20

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

01/29/2020:ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS (20 DAY) TO TRACY Q PHILMAN

01/22/2020:SUMMONS (20 DAY) TO TRACY Q PHILMAN

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

01/22/2020:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 09/30/2020 10:00; Judge: LANCASTER, SHEREE H; Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT CONF; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE CHAMBE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 9/30/20 @ 10:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketEvent CASE MANAGEMENT CONF scheduled on 9/30/2020 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge SHEREE LANCASTER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT RETURN OF SERVICE TO TRACY PHILMAN ON 2-15-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (20 DAY) TO TRACY Q PHILMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 16299

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase 212020CC000004CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant