This case was last updated from Gilchrist County Courts on 09/02/2020 at 17:38:34 (UTC).

MONTNEY, KENNETH ALAN, MONTNEY, LEE SIMMONS Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 MONTNEY, KENNETH ALAN, MONTNEY, LEE SIMMONS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Gilchrist County Courts, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Groeb, Robert K, GROEB, ROBERT KIRK and Robert Groeb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Groeb, Robert K

GROEB, ROBERT KIRK

Robert Groeb

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MONTNEY, KENNETH ALAN

MONTNEY, LEE SIMMONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WALKER, FOYE BUCHANNON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 8-21-20-LEVY COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE NON SERVED 8-17-20-GCSO, CURRENTLY INCARCERATED IN LEVY JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR KENNETH MONTNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketPROCESS SERVICE MEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketPROCESS SERVICE MEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 8/25/2020 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge Robert Groeb presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE 8-25-20 AT 10:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR KENNETH MONTNEY IN GILCHRIST COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketPROCESS SERVICE MEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE OF LEE MONTNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketPERMISSION TO USE EMAIL-LEE MONTNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT FOR LEE MONTNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR TEMPORARY SUPPORT AND OTHER RELIEF WITH NO MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketAPPROVAL OF INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCase 212020DR000146DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/3/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketJudge: Groeb , Robert K assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Walker, Foye Buchannon