This case was last updated from Gilchrist County Courts on 07/16/2020 at 16:27:47 (UTC).

MIKELL, DAWN MICHELE VS MIKELL, JEFFREY

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 MIKELL, DAWN MICHELE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MIKELL, JEFFREY. This case was filed in Gilchrist County Courts, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert Groeb, Groeb, Robert K and GROEB, ROBERT KIRK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Robert Groeb

Groeb, Robert K

GROEB, ROBERT KIRK

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MIKELL, DAWN MICHELE

Respondent

MIKELL, JEFFREY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketREPORT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketRECORDED ORDER : FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRAIGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketDISPOSITION FORM FROM HEARING HELD 4-28-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketORDER FOR HEARING TO PROCEED BY VIDEO CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketEvent STATUS CONFERENCE scheduled on 4/28/2020 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge Robert Groeb presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketORDER RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE AND/OR NON JURY TRIAL 03/24/2020 CANCELLED / RESET 04/28/2020 @9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 3/24/2020 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge Robert Groeb presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING HEARING 3-24-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketPERMISSION TO USE EMAIL-DAWN MIKELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE OF DAWN MIKELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketAPPROVAL OF INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCase 212020DR000023DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/6/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketJudge: Groeb , Robert K assigned

    Read MoreRead Less