This case was last updated from Gilchrist County Courts on 09/09/2020 at 16:38:59 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS SCHIAVONE, FELISHA

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SCHIAVONE, FELISHA. This case was filed in Gilchrist County Courts, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LANCASTER, SHEREE HIERS, LANCASTER, SHEREE H and SHEREE LANCASTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LANCASTER, SHEREE HIERS

LANCASTER, SHEREE H

SHEREE LANCASTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

SCHIAVONE, FELISHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHATANI, PAYAL YASHWANT

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

08/25/2020:ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED TO FELISHA SCHIAVONE

08/24/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO FELISHA SCHIAVONE

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/10/2020:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS

08/10/2020:SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/10/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 10/21/2020 09:30; Judge: LANCASTER, SHEREE H; Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE CHAMBE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO FELISHA SCHIAVONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 10/21/2020 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge SHEREE LANCASTER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 18320

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCase 212020SC000094SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHATANI , PAYAL