This case was last updated from Gilchrist County Courts on 07/16/2020 at 21:04:34 (UTC).

LAYFIELD, CHRISTOPHER R VS LAYFIELD, ANDREA R

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 LAYFIELD, CHRISTOPHER R filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LAYFIELD, ANDREA R. This case was filed in Gilchrist County Courts, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Groeb, Robert K and GROEB, ROBERT KIRK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Groeb, Robert K

GROEB, ROBERT KIRK

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAYFIELD, CHRISTOPHER R

Respondent

LAYFIELD, ANDREA R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 6-4-20-LEVY COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT FOR ANDREA LAYFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER-ANDREA LAYFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketPERMISSION TO USE EMAIL-ANDREA LAYFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketPROCESS SERVICE MEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR ANDREA LAYFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER-CHRISTOPHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN PROPOSED BY CHRISTOPHER LAYFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT FOR CHRISTOPHER LAYFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHLDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketAPPROVAL OF INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCase 212020DR000092DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketJudge: Groeb , Robert K assigned

    Read MoreRead Less