This case was last updated from Gilchrist County Courts on 07/31/2020 at 17:39:02 (UTC).

JOHNSON, WALTER LEE VS JOHNSTON, LORNA MORGAN

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 JOHNSON, WALTER LEE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JOHNSTON, LORNA MORGAN. This case was filed in Gilchrist County Courts, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MILLER-JONES, SUSAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MILLER-JONES, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOHNSON, WALTER LEE

Respondent

JOHNSTON, LORNA MORGAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ALLEN, NATASHA MUNKITTRICK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCOUNTER AND CROSS CLAIMS/PETITIONS - GENERAL CIVIL $395.00 FILING FEE ANSWER TO HUSBANDS PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY AND REQUEST FOR SPOUSAL SUPPORT AND WIFES COUNTER PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND RELATED RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $395.00 Receipt Number MX 18229

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $395.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR LORNA JOHNSTON SIGNED BY THE CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number MX 17989

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage WITH PROPERTY AND REQUEST FOR SPOUSAL SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCase 212020DR000128DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/2/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALLEN, NATASHA MUNKITTRICK