This case was last updated from Gilchrist County Courts on 11/14/2021 at 09:03:20 (UTC).

GREEN, EVELYN, SCHNORBUS, WILLIAM Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 GREEN, EVELYN, SCHNORBUS, WILLIAM was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Gilchrist County Courts, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRASINGTON, MONICA J and MONICA BRASINGTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRASINGTON, MONICA J

MONICA BRASINGTON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SCHNORBUS, WILLIAM

Decedent

GREEN, EVELYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Petitioner Attorney

LANDER, LINDSEY BOYD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE AND ORDER CLOSING ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketWaiver OF ACCOUNTING AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY; AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketPetition for Discharge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (VIA TELEPHONE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketEvent CASE MANAGEMENT CONF scheduled on 10/30/2020 at 1130 AM, MX - Judge MONICA BRASINGTON presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF - RECEIPT FOR FLORIDA MEDICAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE - ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF LWT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF DC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION - VERIFIED PETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 16283

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase 212020CP000001CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANDER, LINDSEY BOYD