This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Gilchrist County on 04/21/2022 at 07:24:29 (UTC).

GADDY, BARBARA B VS PARFITT, DEBORAH

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 GADDY, BARBARA B filed an Other lawsuit against PARFITT, DEBORAH. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Gilchrist County, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GROEB, ROBERT KIRK, Groeb, Robert K and Robert Groeb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GROEB, ROBERT KIRK

Groeb, Robert K

Robert Groeb

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GADDY, BARBARA B

Defendant

PARFITT, DEBORAH

Not Classified By Court

LUTTMANN, DEBORAH A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZBRZEZNJ, LYDIA STURGIS

Defendant Attorney

KANGAS, MICHAEL RYAN

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT

04/20/2022:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT

ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE

04/08/2022:ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE

PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT

04/01/2022:PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT

ORIGINAL ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/29/2022:ORIGINAL ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

HEARING DISPOSITION FORM FROM 03/15/22

03/15/2022:HEARING DISPOSITION FORM FROM 03/15/22

OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT

03/14/2022:OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

03/07/2022:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

03/07/2022:RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT & PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

03/01/2022:ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT & PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT & PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

02/25/2022:MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT & PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT

02/10/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT

NOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING

02/08/2022:NOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING

NOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING

02/08/2022:NOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING

ANSWER TO DEFENDANT'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM

01/31/2022:ANSWER TO DEFENDANT'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM

MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN AVOIDANCE

01/31/2022:MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN AVOIDANCE

NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET ON INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

01/27/2022:NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET ON INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

01/27/2022:NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

MOTION TO PROHIBIT DEFENDANT FROM USING TRUST ASSETS TO PAY ATTORNEYS' FEES FOR COSTS IN CONNECTION WITH THIS MATTER AND COMPELLING DEFENDANT TO DISGORGE ALL ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS ALREADY PAID

01/13/2022:MOTION TO PROHIBIT DEFENDANT FROM USING TRUST ASSETS TO PAY ATTORNEYS' FEES FOR COSTS IN CONNECTION WITH THIS MATTER AND COMPELLING DEFENDANT TO DISGORGE ALL ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS ALREADY PAID

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/15/2022 13:00; Judge: Groeb, Robert K; Docket Type: HEARING-CIRCUIT CIV; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR; Defendant Attorney: Kangas, Michael R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING DISPOSITION FORM FROM 03/15/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT & PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS TO DEBORAH PARFITT - ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLATORY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 23063

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCase 212021CA000054CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KANGAS , MICHAEL RYAN