This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Gilchrist County on 11/10/2019 at 15:30:15 (UTC).

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC VS LOY, ANGELA J Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 DITECH FINANCIAL LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LOY, ANGELA J. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Gilchrist County, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MILLER-JONES, SUSAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Gilchrist County

  • Courthouse:

    Gilchrist County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MILLER-JONES, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

Defendants

LOY, CARL H

UNKNOWN TENANT

LOY, ANGELA J

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

THE RIVERWALK OF FANNING SPRIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALBAUM, BRIAN DANIEL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS TO THE RIVERWALK OF FANNING SPRINGS OWNERSHIP ASSOCIATION, INC

10/28/2019:SUMMONS TO THE RIVERWALK OF FANNING SPRINGS OWNERSHIP ASSOCIATION, INC

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/28/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN TENANT

10/28/2019:SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN TENANT

SUMMONS TO CARL H. LOY, aka Carl Hutchins Loy

10/28/2019:SUMMONS TO CARL H. LOY, aka Carl Hutchins Loy

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

10/28/2019:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS TO THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

10/28/2019:SUMMONS TO THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

SUMMONS TO ANGELA J. LOY, aka Angela Jene Reiter, aka Angela Jane Loy

10/28/2019:SUMMONS TO ANGELA J. LOY, aka Angela Jene Reiter, aka Angela Jane Loy

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

11/07/2019:ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

Receipt

10/29/2019:Receipt

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

10/30/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

10/28/2019:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

CERTIFICATE OF ORIGINAL NOTE POSSESSION

10/28/2019:CERTIFICATE OF ORIGINAL NOTE POSSESSION

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Payment received: $970.00 Receipt Number MX 15442

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $50.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $905.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Assessment 3 Total Assessed $15.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO THE RIVERWALK OF FANNING SPRINGS OWNERSHIP ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO ANGELA J. LOY, aka Angela Jene Reiter, aka Angela Jane Loy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO CARL H. LOY, aka Carl Hutchins Loy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ORIGINAL NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • Case 212019CA000068CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less