This case was last updated from Gilchrist County Courts on 08/21/2019 00:47:27

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 a Other case was filed by DISCOVER BANK against ACKART, PATRICK B in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County Courts, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number ****************AXMX
  • Filing Date 06/14/2019
  • Case Status Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type Other
  • Jurisdiction Gilchrist County Courts
  • Judge LANCASTER, SHEREE H
  • Courthouse Gilchrist County Courthouse
  • County Gilchrist
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Defendant ACKART, PATRICK B
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff DISCOVER BANK
  • Represented By
    • CHARLET, CHRISTINA N.

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

08/19/2019:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS TO PATRICK B ACKART

06/14/2019:SUMMONS TO PATRICK B ACKART

Free with Subscription
RETURN OF SERVICE TO PATRICK B. ACKART - SUBSTITUTE SERVED O...

07/30/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE TO PATRICK B. ACKART - SUBSTITU...

Free with Subscription
ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

07/01/2019:ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

Free with Subscription
MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

06/14/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

Free with Subscription
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

08/19/2019:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED
  • 08/19/2019
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
  • 08/19/2019
  • VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
  • 07/30/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE TO PATRICK B. ACKART - SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON 7/23/2019
  • 07/01/2019
  • ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS TO PATRICK B ACKART
  • 06/14/2019
  • MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
  • 06/14/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET
  • 06/14/2019
  • COMPLAINT
  • 06/14/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 14043
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned
  • 06/14/2019
  • Case 212019CC000042CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/14/2019

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.