This case was last updated from Gilchrist County Courts on 04/20/2022 at 06:50:57 (UTC).

DAVIS, MICHAEL RICHARD VS DAVIS, ANDREA LEE

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 DAVIS, MICHAEL RICHARD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DAVIS, ANDREA LEE. This case was filed in Gilchrist County Courts, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GROEB, ROBERT KIRK, Groeb, Robert K and Robert Groeb. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GROEB, ROBERT KIRK

Groeb, Robert K

Robert Groeb

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DAVIS, MICHAEL RICHARD

Respondent

DAVIS, ANDREA LEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketJUDGES NOTES FROM HEARING HELD 11-23-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketREPORT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 11/23/2021 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge Robert Groeb presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING HEARING 11-23-21 AT 9:30 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE OF BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER -ANDREA DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER-MICHAEL DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketPERMISSION TO USE EMAIL-MICHAEL DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketPERMISSION TO USE EMAIL-ANDREA DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT OF DISSOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 22741

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCase 212021DR000224DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketJudge: Groeb , Robert K assigned

    Read MoreRead Less