This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Gilchrist County on 04/21/2022 at 07:31:30 (UTC).

CURTS, FELIPE VS GINNIE SPRINGS OUTDOORS LLC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 CURTS, FELIPE filed an Other lawsuit against GINNIE SPRINGS OUTDOORS LLC. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Gilchrist County, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GROEB, ROBERT KIRK, Groeb, Robert K and Robert Groeb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GROEB, ROBERT KIRK

Groeb, Robert K

Robert Groeb

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CURTS, FELIPE

Defendants

GINNIE SPRINGS OUTDOORS LLC

DAVIS, ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOSTER, SARAH ALLEN

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT GINNIE SPRINGS OUTDOORS LLC

04/18/2022:PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT GINNIE SPRINGS OUTDOORS LLC

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT GINNIE SPRINGS OUTDOORS LLC

04/18/2022:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT GINNIE SPRINGS OUTDOORS LLC

NOTICE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 5/3/22@10:30AM

04/13/2022:NOTICE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 5/3/22@10:30AM

DEFENDANT'S AMENDED ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

04/12/2022:DEFENDANT'S AMENDED ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS FOR ROBERT DAVIS --ISSUED BY CLERK

04/08/2022:SUMMONS FOR ROBERT DAVIS --ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS

04/08/2022:SUMMONS

ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT

04/08/2022:ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

04/04/2022:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF HEARING 5/3/22@10:30AM

03/17/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING 5/3/22@10:30AM

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/03/2022:MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

03/02/2022:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/02/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS

02/28/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS

02/28/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

02/22/2022:CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

NOTICE OF FILING - NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON DEFENDANT

02/21/2022:NOTICE OF FILING - NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON DEFENDANT

RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/18/2022:RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

02/18/2022:NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 05/03/2022 10:30; Judge: Groeb, Robert K; Docket Type: MOTION HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT GINNIE SPRINGS OUTDOORS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT GINNIE SPRINGS OUTDOORS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event MOTION HEARING on 5/3/2022 1030 AM Judge Robert Groeb results CANCELLED on 4/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 5/3/22@10:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S AMENDED ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS FOR ROBERT DAVIS --ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 24426

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO GINNIE SPRINGS OUTDOORS c/o MAC BRACEWELL JR. - ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $495.00 Receipt Number MX 23332

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $495.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCase 212021CA000057CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOSTER, SARAH ALLEN