This case was last updated from Gilchrist County Courts on 08/14/2020 at 13:04:00 (UTC).

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION VS MCKENZIE, SARAH Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against MCKENZIE, SARAH. This case was filed in Gilchrist County Courts, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LANCASTER, SHEREE HIERS and LANCASTER, SHEREE H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LANCASTER, SHEREE HIERS

LANCASTER, SHEREE H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Defendants

MCKENZIE, SARAH

SPINKS, CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT

 

Court Documents

ORDER

08/12/2020:ORDER

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED DECLARATION OF CANCELLED SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT, CHRISTOPHER SPINKS

07/30/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED DECLARATION OF CANCELLED SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT, CHRISTOPHER SPINKS

RETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE - SARAH MCKENZIE

07/06/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE - SARAH MCKENZIE

Receipt

03/05/2020:Receipt

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

03/02/2020:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS TO SARAH MCKENZIE

03/02/2020:SUMMONS TO SARAH MCKENZIE

SUMMONS TO CHRISTOPHER SPINKS

03/02/2020:SUMMONS TO CHRISTOPHER SPINKS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/02/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED DECLARATION OF CANCELLED SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT, CHRISTOPHER SPINKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE - SARAH MCKENZIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 16863

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO SARAH MCKENZIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO CHRISTOPHER SPINKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCase 212020CC000014CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/2/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Credit Acceptance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JASON DRAGUTSKY